MA S2199 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 28 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S1231
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislation to establish and financing a drug collection and disposal program, report the accompanying Order (Senate, No. 2199).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health issues

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-13SenateReported (in part) by S1231
2016-06-13SenateReported (in part) by S1216
2016-05-23SenateReported (in part) by S1220
2016-05-23SenateReported (in part) by S1151
2016-05-23SenateReported (in part) by S1139
2016-03-31SenateReported (in part) by S1144
2016-03-31SenateDischarged to the committee on Senate Rules
2016-03-28SenateOrder reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
2016-03-28SenateAccompanied by S1115, S1117, S1121, S1127, S1129, S1131, S1133, S1135, S1136, S1138, S1139, S1142, S1144, S1145, S1146, S1149, S1151, S1152, S1154, S1157, S1158, S1159, S1160, S1163, S1167, S1169, S1170, S1171, S1172, S1173, S1174, S1175, S1176, S1182, S1183, S1184, S1185, S1186, S1187, S1190, S1192, S1194, S1195, S1197, S1199, S1200, S1201, S1202, S1204, S1209, S1214, S1215, S1216, S1217, S1219, S1220, S1223, S1224, S1225, S1226, S1230, S1231, S1232 and S1233
2016-03-28SenateReported from the committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S1115 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1117 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1121 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1127 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1129 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1131 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1133 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1135 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1136 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1138 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1139 (Replaces) 2016-05-23 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1142 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1144 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4307
S1145 (Replaces) 2016-12-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1146 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1149 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1151 (Replaces) 2016-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2334
S1152 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1154 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1157 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1158 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1159 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1160 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1163 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1167 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1169 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1170 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1171 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1172 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1173 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1174 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1175 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1176 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1182 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1183 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1184 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1185 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1186 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1187 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1190 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1192 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1194 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1195 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1197 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1199 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1200 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1201 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1202 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1204 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1209 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1214 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1215 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1216 (Replaces) 2016-09-15 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1217 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1219 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1220 (Replaces) 2016-07-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
S1223 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1224 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1225 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1226 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1230 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1231 (Replaces) 2016-06-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2352
S1232 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1233 (Replaces) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S2128 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - New draft substituted, see S2296
S2438 (Similar To) -
H4147 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Referred to the committee on House Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets
S2114 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2329
H4473 (Similar To) 2017-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 374 of the Acts of 2016
S1178 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2128
S1208 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4065
S2204 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S2214 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Reported in part by S679
S2365 (Similar To) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1206 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
H1943 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H1914 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4039
H1970 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback