MA S2438 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to job creation, workforce development and infrastructure investment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Starter Home Districts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
No history available at this time.

Same As/Similar To

S1263 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S827 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1646 (Similar To) 2016-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 228 of the Acts of 2016
S500 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1648 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback