MA S827 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2204
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to improving training for child advocates to recognize indictors of domestic violence. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to improving training for child advocates to recognize indicators of domestic violence
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Forry [D] | Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Marjorie Decker [D] |
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2204 |
2015-07-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2204 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S1211 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1311 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1280 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied S1311
S1573 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1179 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2211
S1256 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S2053 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - Ordered to a third reading
S1220 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
S682 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S699 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S586 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1258 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
S1211 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1311 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1280 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied S1311
S1573 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1179 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2211
S1256 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S2053 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - Ordered to a third reading
S1220 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
S682 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S699 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S586 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1258 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S827 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S827.pdf |