MA S1280 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S1311

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Accompanied S1311
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to police training. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to police training

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-11SenateAccompanied S1311
2016-01-28JointHearing scheduled for 02/04/2016 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S1311 (Replaced by) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S751 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1606 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1914 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S541 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
H1007 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4636

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback