MA S541 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2318

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to out-of-pocket expenses for prescription drug coverage. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning out-of-pocket expenses for prescription drug coverage

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-06SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2318
2015-11-10JointHearing scheduled for 11/17/2015 from 01:00 AM-04:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S2318 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S751 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1606 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1280 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied S1311
S1914 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1007 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4636
S1436 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1752 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
S1548 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S724 (Similar To) 2015-06-22 - Accompanied H1354
S1447 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
H2241 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback