MA S724 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H1354

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Accompanied H1354
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to consolidating statutes pertaining to jury service. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consolidating statutes pertaining to jury service

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-22HouseAccompanied H1354
2015-05-20JointHearing scheduled for 05/27/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H1354 (Replaced by) 2016-02-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2016
H1373 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1392 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S1747 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1447 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback