MA S1752 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2366

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to increase container recycling in the Commonwealth. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To increase container recycling in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-23SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2366
2015-10-20JointHearing scheduled for 10/27/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S2366 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S399 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1553 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S407 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1073 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1074 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2310 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback