MA S407 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2380

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to require registration of recycling contractors. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring registration of recycling contractors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-05SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2380
2015-06-18JointHearing scheduled for 06/23/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S2380 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S743 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H242 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
S1220 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
S616 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S872 (Similar To) 2016-07-23 - New draft substituted, see S2444

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback