MA S2380 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on July 5 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to environmental issues.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental issues

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-08SenateDischarged to the committee on Senate Rules
2016-07-05SenateOrder reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
2016-07-05SenateAccompanied by S395, S398, S399, S402, S403, S405, S407, S409, S412, S413, S418, S421, S426, S430, S434, S435, S436, S438, S439, S441, S442, S448, S449, S459, S461, S462, S464, S465, S466, S467, S468, S470, S472 and S474
2016-07-05SenateReported from the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S395 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S398 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S399 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S402 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S403 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S405 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S407 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S409 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S412 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S413 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S418 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S421 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S426 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S430 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S434 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S435 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S436 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S438 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S439 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S441 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S442 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S448 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S449 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S459 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S461 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S462 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S464 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S465 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S466 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S467 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S468 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S470 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S472 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S474 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S2259 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - See H3611
S2258 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Reprinted as amended, see S2286
S2261 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4321 (Similar To) 2016-05-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4466 (Similar To) 2016-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4692
S1786 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1127 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1785 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S400 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4167
S1660 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2016 from 10:30 AM-12:00 PM in 222
H2086 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback