MA S2258 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2171
Note: Replaces legislation S2286
Note: Replaces legislation S2286
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Reprinted as amended, see S2286
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Reprinted as amended, see S2286
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The committee on Ways and Means, to whom was referred the Senate Bill to promote agriculture in the Commonwealth (Senate, No. 2171),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft entitled “An Act promoting agriculture in the Commonwealth” (Senate, No. 2258).
Title
Promoting agriculture in the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S2286 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Read third |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Ordered to third reading |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Substituted, as amended, for S2171 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Amendment #16 (Spilka) adopted |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Amendment #8 (Tarr) adopted |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Amendment #18 (Tarr) rejected |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Amendment #17 (Tarr) adopted |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Amendment #15 (Tarr) adopted |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Amendment #12 (Keenan) adopted |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Amendment #11 (Keenan) adopted |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Amendment #10 (Tarr) ruled unconstitutional |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Amendment #9 (Downing) rejected |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Eldridge) adopted |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Amendment #5 (deMacedo) adopted |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Timilty) rejected |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Creem) adopted |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Creem) adopted - Roll Call #289 [YEAS 24 - NAYS 12] |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Moore) rejected |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, May 5, 2016 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Recommended new draft of S2171 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S2171 (Replaces) 2016-05-05 - New draft substituted, see S2258
S2286 (Replaces) 2016-05-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2153 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2468 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2505 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 448 of the Acts of 2016
S743 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H242 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
S1220 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
S2524 (Similar To) 2016-12-28 - See H4326
S1686 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1186 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S526 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S439 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S457 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - New draft substituted, see S2309
S972 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2286 (Replaces) 2016-05-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2153 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2468 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2505 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 448 of the Acts of 2016
S743 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H242 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
S1220 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
S2524 (Similar To) 2016-12-28 - See H4326
S1686 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1186 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S526 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S439 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S457 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - New draft substituted, see S2309
S972 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2258 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2258.pdf |