MA S2171 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H688
Note: Legislation replaced by S2258

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - New draft substituted, see S2258
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislation to exempt the personal use of milk and raw milk products by owners of cows and goats from certain laws governing the use of said products,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2171).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote agriculture in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-05SenateNew draft substituted, see S2258
2016-05-05SenateRead second
2016-04-28SenatePlaced in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, May 5, 2016
2016-04-28SenateOrder relative to subject matter adopted
2016-04-28SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2258
2016-03-10SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2016-03-10SenateNew draft of H688, H689, H748, H3648, S411, S417, S419 and S425
2016-03-10SenateReported from the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

H688 (Replaces) 2016-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2171
S2258 (Replaced by) 2016-05-05 - Reprinted as amended, see S2286
S2286 (Similar To) 2016-05-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2209 (Similar To) -
S743 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H242 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
S1220 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
S439 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S457 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - New draft substituted, see S2309
S972 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback