MA S2286 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting agriculture in the Commonwealth.
Title
Promoting agriculture in the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-05-09 | House | Read; and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #291 [YEAS 36 - NAYS 1] |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Text of S2258, printed as amended |
Same As/Similar To
S2171 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - New draft substituted, see S2258
S2258 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Reprinted as amended, see S2286
S439 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S457 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - New draft substituted, see S2309
S972 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2524 (Similar To) 2016-12-28 - See H4326
S1389 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1743 (Similar To) 2015-10-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1482 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S2258 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Reprinted as amended, see S2286
S439 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S457 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - New draft substituted, see S2309
S972 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2524 (Similar To) 2016-12-28 - See H4326
S1389 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1743 (Similar To) 2015-10-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1482 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2286 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2286.pdf |