MA S2209 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate April 5, 2016 -- Text of amendment (50) (offered by Senator Spilka) to the Senate Bill enhancing reform, innovation and success in education (Senate, No. 2203)
Title
Corrective Amendment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
No history available at this time. |
Same As/Similar To
S48 (Similar To) 2015-04-15 - See S44
S49 (Similar To) 2015-04-15 - See S44
S1938 (Similar To) 2015-06-01 - See S3
S2059 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - See H3570
S2333 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - See S2311
S2332 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - See S2311
S661 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2184
H68 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H69 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H65 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Reported by H3333
H64 (Similar To) 2015-04-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2015
S49 (Similar To) 2015-04-15 - See S44
S1938 (Similar To) 2015-06-01 - See S3
S2059 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - See H3570
S2333 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - See S2311
S2332 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - See S2311
S661 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2184
H68 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H69 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H65 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Reported by H3333
H64 (Similar To) 2015-04-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2015
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2209 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2209.pdf |