MA H65 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Reported by H3333
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Reported by H3333
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2015 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Title
Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2015 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Reported by H3333 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee of conference appointed (Spilka-DiDomenico-deMacedo), in concurrence |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate insists on its amendment |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-03-25 | House | Committee of conference appointed (Dempsey-Kulik-Smola) |
2015-03-25 | House | House NON-concurred in the Senate amendments |
2015-03-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2015-03-19 | Senate | For text of S21, printed as amended, see S28 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read third |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S21, amended |
2015-03-19 | Senate | For Senate actions, see S21 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read second |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for March 19, 2015 |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S21 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-03-11 | House | Passed to be engrossed 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 25) |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment 16 adopted |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment 15 adopted |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment 5 rejected 33 YEAS to 121 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 24) |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment 4 rejected 8 YEAS to 146 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 23) |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment 3 rejected |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment 1 rejected |
2015-03-11 | House | Read third |
2015-03-11 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-03-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-03-11 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-03-11 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-03-11 | House | Reported on a part of H60 |
2015-03-11 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H3333 (Replaces) 2015-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2015
S21 (Replaced by) 2015-03-19 - See H65
S28 (Replaced by) 2015-03-19 - Text of S21, printed as amended
H66 (Similar To) 2015-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2015
H3189 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H3203 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - House insisted on its amendment
H3773 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Published as amended, see H3785
H3772 (Similar To) 2015-12-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 142 of the Acts of 2015
H4765 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2233
H4766 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2377
H4767 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
S21 (Replaced by) 2015-03-19 - See H65
S28 (Replaced by) 2015-03-19 - Text of S21, printed as amended
H66 (Similar To) 2015-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2015
H3189 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H3203 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - House insisted on its amendment
H3773 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Published as amended, see H3785
H3772 (Similar To) 2015-12-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 142 of the Acts of 2015
H4765 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2233
H4766 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2377
H4767 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H65 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H65.pdf |