MA H3772 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3570
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on December 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 142 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on December 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 142 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a State Workforce Development Board
Title
Establishing a State Workforce Development Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-02 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 142 of the Acts of 2015 | |
2015-11-23 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-11-23 | House | Enacted |
2015-11-23 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-11-23 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-11-23 | House | House concurred in the still further Senate amendment |
2015-11-23 | House | Bills in the Third Reading special report accepted |
2015-11-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House further amendment with a still further amendment, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2059 |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-11-18 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment |
2015-11-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-10-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Pending amendment #2 (Chang-Diaz) adopted, as amended |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Further amendment #2.1 (Chandler) adopted |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Chang-Diaz) pending |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Chang-Diaz) adopted -see Roll Call #194 [YEAS 37 - NAYS 0] |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Read second |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, October 22, 2015 |
2015-10-15 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2015-10-07 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-09-28 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-09-28 | House | New draft of H3570 |
2015-09-28 | House | Pending new draft of H3570 |
2015-09-28 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H65 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Reported by H3333
H66 (Similar To) 2015-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2015
H3189 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H3203 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - House insisted on its amendment
H3773 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Published as amended, see H3785
H4765 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2233
H4766 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2377
H4767 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
H3570 (Replaces) 2015-09-28 - New draft substituted, see H3772
H66 (Similar To) 2015-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2015
H3189 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H3203 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - House insisted on its amendment
H3773 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Published as amended, see H3785
H4765 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2233
H4766 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2377
H4767 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
H3570 (Replaces) 2015-09-28 - New draft substituted, see H3772
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3772 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3772.pdf |