MA H3189 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2015 - 50% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for an employee retirement incentive program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for an employee retirement incentive program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-04HouseReported by H3353
2015-04-27SenateCommittee of conference appointed (Spilka-Timilty-deMacedo), in concurrence
2015-04-27SenateSenate insisted on its amendments
2015-04-27SenateRules suspended
2015-04-27HouseCommittee of conference appointed (Dempsey-Murphy-Hill)
2015-04-27HouseHouse NON-concurred in the Senate amendment
2015-04-27HouseReferred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
2015-04-15SenatePassed to be engrossed
2015-04-15SenateReprinted as amended, see S50
2015-04-15SenateRead third
2015-04-15SenateOrderd to a third reading
2015-04-15SenateFor Senate action, see S44
2015-04-15SenateAmended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S44, as amended
2015-04-15SenateRead second
2015-04-09SenateOrder relative to subject matter adopted
2015-03-26SenateRead; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2015-03-25HousePassed to be engrossed 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 26)
2015-03-25HouseAmendment 8 adopted
2015-03-25HouseAmendment 7 rejected
2015-03-25HouseAmendment 1 adopted
2015-03-25HouseRead second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third
2015-03-25HouseRules suspended
2015-03-25HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2015-03-25HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2015-03-25HouseReported on a part of H1
2015-03-25HouseReported from the committee on House Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

S50 (Replaces) 2015-04-15 - Passed to be engrossed
H3353 (Replaces) 2015-05-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 19 of the Acts of 2015
S44 (Replaced by) 2015-04-15 - See H3189
H65 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Reported by H3333
H66 (Similar To) 2015-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2015
H3203 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - House insisted on its amendment
H3773 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Published as amended, see H3785
H3772 (Similar To) 2015-12-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 142 of the Acts of 2015
H4765 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2233
H4766 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2377
H4767 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback