MA H64 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Simon Valedi, an employee of the Massachusetts Department of Transportation. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Simon Valedi, an employee of the Massachusetts Department of Transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2015 | |
2015-04-09 | House | Enacted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-04-09 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-03-23 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2015-03-19 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-03-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-03-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2747 (Similar To) 2016-04-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2016
H3007 (Similar To) 2015-10-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2923 (Similar To) 2015-12-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H386 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4143
H3188 (Similar To) 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2015
H3007 (Similar To) 2015-10-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2923 (Similar To) 2015-12-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H386 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4143
H3188 (Similar To) 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2015
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H64 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H64.pdf |