MA S743 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2204

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to divorce procedures and judgments in certain Probate Court decisions. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to equitable divorce proceedings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-04SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2204
2015-07-15JointHearing scheduled for 07/22/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S2204 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S712 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S685 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S1240 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1817 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2273
S760 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1220 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
S872 (Similar To) 2016-07-23 - New draft substituted, see S2444
S1686 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H242 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
S616 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S2524 (Similar To) 2016-12-28 - See H4326
S1186 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S526 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S439 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S457 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - New draft substituted, see S2309
S972 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback