MA S616 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2356

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to benefit the Health Safety Net Trust Fund. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To benefit the Health Safety Net Trust Fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-23SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2356
2015-05-29JointHearing scheduled for 06/03/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

S2356 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S531 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S872 (Similar To) 2016-07-23 - New draft substituted, see S2444
S1686 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1186 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S526 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S743 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H242 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
S1220 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
S439 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1362 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1504 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S457 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - New draft substituted, see S2309

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback