MA H242 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4578

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to further regulating telecommunications systems contractors and technicians. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to telecommunications systems contractors and technicians

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-15HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4578
2015-05-27JointHearing scheduled for 06/02/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H4578 (Replaced by) 2016-08-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H262 (Similar To) 2016-05-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S743 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1220 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
S616 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S872 (Similar To) 2016-07-23 - New draft substituted, see S2444

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback