MA S1220 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2199
Note: Legislation replaced by S2468

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-07-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to reduce the risks associated with allergic reactions. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To reduce the risks associated with allergic reactions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-28SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2468
2016-05-23SenateDischarged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2016-03-28SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2199
2015-09-10JointHearing scheduled for 09/17/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S2199 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S1231
S2468 (Replaced by) 2016-07-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1100 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1056 (Similar To) 2016-07-12 - New draft substituted, see S2408
S972 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1172 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S986 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1240 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1434 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1280 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied S1311
S1813 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback