MA S1056 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2408
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-12 - New draft substituted, see S2408
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-12 - New draft substituted, see S2408
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to solar drying of laundry. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to solar drying of laundry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-12 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2408 |
2016-07-12 | Senate | Read second |
2016-07-07 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2016-07-07 | Senate | New draft (Barrett) pending, see S2408 |
2016-07-07 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Order of the Day for Tuesday, July 12, 2016 |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2015-06-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/16/2015 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in 222 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2408 (Replaced by) 2016-07-21 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S1704 (Similar To) 2015-10-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4185 (Similar To) 2016-10-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 292 of the Acts of 2016
S1922 (Similar To) 2015-05-27 - Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1664 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1704 (Similar To) 2015-10-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4185 (Similar To) 2016-10-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 292 of the Acts of 2016
S1922 (Similar To) 2015-05-27 - Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1664 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1056 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1056.pdf |