CA AB459 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 12525.5 of the Government Code, relating to law enforcement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Peace officers: Attorney General: reports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 459 Haney Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-07-03SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 2).
2024-06-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2024-06-12SenateRe-referred to Coms. on PUB S. and JUD.
2024-06-10SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2023-09-14SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2023-09-14SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2023-09-13SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2023-09-13SenateSenate Rules Suspended
2023-06-27SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2023-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2023-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2023-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1982.)
2023-05-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
2023-05-03AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2023-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-13AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2023-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 11).
2023-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2023-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2023-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2023-03-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2023-03-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2023-02-07AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
2023-02-06AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12525.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB459
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB459#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB459#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB459#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB459#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB459#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB459#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB459#93AMD
Roll Callhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB459

Bill Comments

feedback