MA S685 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2214
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize Performance-Based Education Funding. Higher Education.
Title
Authorizing performance-based education funding
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2214 |
2015-08-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/16/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2214 (Replaced by) 2016-04-14 - Reported in part by S679
S276 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2338
H1069 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3950
S302 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
S264 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
S278 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2346
H374 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H434 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4600
S276 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2338
H1069 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3950
S302 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
S264 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
S278 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2346
H374 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H434 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4600
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S685 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S685.pdf |