MA S2214 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Reported in part by S679
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislation to establish a Master of Library Science assistance program, report the accompanying Order (Senate, No. 2214).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher education matters.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-14SenateReported in part by S679
2016-04-11SenateDischarged to the committee on Senate Rules
2016-04-07SenateOrder reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
2016-04-07SenateAccompanied by S652, S654, S656, S666, S667, S668, S670, S674, S675, S679, S680, S681, S682, S684, S685 and S686
2016-04-07SenateReported from the committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

S652 (Replaces) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S654 (Replaces) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S656 (Replaces) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S666 (Replaces) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S667 (Replaces) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S668 (Replaces) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S670 (Replaces) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S674 (Replaces) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S675 (Replaces) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S679 (Replaces) 2016-07-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2465
S680 (Replaces) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S681 (Replaces) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S682 (Replaces) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S684 (Replaces) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S685 (Replaces) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S686 (Replaces) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S2204 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S2199 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S1231
S2365 (Similar To) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2411 (Similar To) 2016-07-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2478 (Similar To) 2016-08-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback