MA S675 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2214
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to open textbooks. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to open textbooks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2214 |
2015-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/03/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2214 (Replaced by) 2016-04-14 - Reported in part by S679
S1526 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4234
S223 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S881 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1193 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Accompanied H2000
S1194 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1526 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4234
S223 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S881 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1193 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Accompanied H2000
S1194 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S675 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S675.pdf |