MA S686 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2214

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a Master of Library Science assistance program. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To establish a Master of Library Science assistance program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-07SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2214
2015-09-09JointHearing scheduled for 10/07/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

S2214 (Replaced by) 2016-04-14 - Reported in part by S679
S590 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S579 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S219 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1084 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1323 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback