MA S1323 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-07 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the Architectural Access Board. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the Architectural Access Board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2016-03-03SenatePassed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #247 [YEAS 36 - NAYS 0]
2016-03-03SenateRead third
2016-03-03SenateOrdered to a third reading
2016-03-03SenateAmendment #9 (Tarr) rejected
2016-03-03SenateAmendment #8 (Tarr) rejected
2016-03-03SenateAmendment #7 (Tarr) rejected
2016-03-03SenateAmendment #6 (Tarr) rejected
2016-03-03SenateAmendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
2016-03-03SenateRead second
2016-02-25SenatePlaced in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 3, 2016
2016-02-25SenateOrder relative to subject matter adopted
2016-02-25SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment
2016-01-21SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2015-10-09JointHearing rescheduled to 10/14/2015 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-1
2015-10-06JointHearing rescheduled to 10/14/2015 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-10-06JointHearing scheduled for 10/14/2015 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S1308 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1241 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1242 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1244 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S140 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1759 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2274
S1363 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1828 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S421 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1771 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
S2333 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - See S2311
S2505 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 448 of the Acts of 2016
S1302 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback