MA S1759 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2274

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2274
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to waste-to-energy facilities. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to waste-to-energy facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-02SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2274
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S2274 (Replaced by) 2016-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1323 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1308 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1363 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1828 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1824 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2266
S421 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1241 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1242 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1244 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S140 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1302 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback