MA S1363 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2314

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to reject that union membership be required to pay the fair share provision. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to collective bargaining

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-06SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2314
2016-01-14JointHearing scheduled for 01/26/2016 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S2314 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1302 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1227 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2187
S1323 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1308 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1759 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2274
S1828 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S421 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback