MA S1227 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2187

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2187
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to cleanliness in restaurants and bars. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to cleanliness in restaurants and bars

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-21SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2187
2015-09-10JointHearing scheduled for 09/17/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S2187 (Replaced by) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1171 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1103 (Similar To) 2016-06-28 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2370
S125 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2244
S1184 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback