MA S747 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to participation in the national nurse licensure compact agreement. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the nurse licensure compact in Massachusetts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-11SenateSenate concurred
2024-03-28HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday July 3, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-10-27JointHearing scheduled for 11/07/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

H1211 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback