IL HB4590 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Animal Welfare Act. Provides that an animal shelter or animal control facility may (rather than shall) waive the adoption fee for a dog or cat if the person adopting the dog or cat is a veteran and meets specified criteria.
Title
ANIMAL ADOPTION-FEE WAIVER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Harry Benton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 605 | 3.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |