MA S1171 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2199

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to encourage quality reviews and reduce costs in health care. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To encourage quality reviews and reduce costs in health care

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-28SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2199
2015-11-09JointHearing scheduled for 11/17/2015 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S2199 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S1231
S1038 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S624 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1177 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied S1188
S1527 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S154 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S1610 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback