MA S125 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2244
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the sale of wine. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to the sale of wine
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2244 |
2015-05-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2244 (Replaced by) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 447 of the Acts of 2016
S739 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S699 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S1287 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1198 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1797 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
S600 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1910 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4083
S229 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S2187 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1412 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S594 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2140
S667 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S1171 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S739 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S699 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S1287 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1198 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1797 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
S600 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1910 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4083
S229 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S2187 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1412 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S594 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2140
S667 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S1171 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S125 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S125.pdf |