MA S739 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2204

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide for the waiver of fees for contesting motor vehicle infractions. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the waiver of fees for contesting motor vehicle infractions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-04SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2204
2015-11-10JointHearing scheduled for 11/18/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S2204 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S773 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S710 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S673 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S675 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S713 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S699 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S1287 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1198 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1797 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
S1412 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S594 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2140
S667 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S82 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2382

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback