MA S594 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2140

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2140
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to eliminate archaic language pertaining to individuals with disabilities in the Commonwealth of Massachusetts. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminating archaic language pertaining to individuals with disabilities in the Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-03SenateNew draft substituted as amended, see S2140
2016-03-03SenateRead second
2016-02-25SenateOrder relative to subject matter adopted
2016-02-25SenateCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 3, 2016 with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2140
2015-07-20SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2015-06-26JointHearing scheduled for 07/01/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

S2140 (Replaced by) 2016-03-03 - Reprinted as amended, see S2167
S1881 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S2330 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S77 (Similar To) 2016-07-27 - New draft substituted, see S2466
S2277 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S80 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S106 (Similar To) 2015-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2202 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2223 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback