MA S699 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2383

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to manufactured housing community owner or operator licensing fees. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to manufactured housing license fees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-05SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2383
2015-12-03JointHearing scheduled for 12/15/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

S2383 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S594 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2140
S597 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1287 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1198 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S715 (Similar To) 2016-07-11 - New draft substituted, see S2419
S1269 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback