MA S2383 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on July 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to public housing, landlord/tenant, condominiums, expiring use, and production

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public housing, landlord/tenant, condominiums, expiring use, and production

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-08SenateDischarged to the committee on Senate Rules
2016-07-05SenateOrder reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
2016-07-05SenateAccompanied by S689, S690, S691, S692, S696, S698, S699, S700, S701, S702, S703, S704, S705, S706, S707, S710, S711, S712, S713, S714, S716, S717, S718, S719, S720, S721, S722, S1166 and S2024
2016-07-05SenateReported from the committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

S689 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S690 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S691 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S692 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S696 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S698 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S699 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S700 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S701 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S702 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S703 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S704 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S705 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S706 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S707 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S710 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S711 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S712 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S713 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S714 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S716 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S717 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S718 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S719 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S720 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S721 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S722 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S1166 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S2024 (Replaces) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
H4135 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4136 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4455 (Similar To) 2016-10-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 298 of the Acts of 2016
H4471 (Similar To) 2016-07-12 - Adopted, in concurrence
S1787 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
S254 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2221
S1696 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S192 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback