MA S722 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2383

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide for a moratorium on the issuance of comprehensive permits and establishing a special commission to investigate the use and effectiveness of the comprehensive permit law. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for a moratorium on the issuance of comprehensive permits and establishing a special commission to investigate the use and effectiveness of the comprehensive permit law

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-05SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2383
2016-01-26JointHearing scheduled for 02/02/2016 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

S2383 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S620 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S626 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
H513 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S932 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H3189 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H3045 (Similar To) 2016-05-23 - Accompanied H3024
S168 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback