MA H513 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to child suicide. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve providing for an investigation and study by a special commission relative to child suicide

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-20HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2016-06-20HouseRules suspended
2016-06-20HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2016-06-06HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2016-06-02HouseDischarged to the committee on House Rules
2016-05-16HouseCommittee reported bill ought to pass and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
2015-06-19JointHearing scheduled for 06/24/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
2015-05-11HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2015-05-01JointHearing scheduled for 05/06/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H417 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4428
H3189 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H3045 (Similar To) 2016-05-23 - Accompanied H3024
H2970 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H3754 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback