MA H3045 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H3024

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Accompanied H3024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to direct the Registrar of Motor Vehicles to implement and regulate the Yellow Dot Program, so-called, to provide important medical information about occupants of motor vehicles. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing an emergency responder yellow dot program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-23HouseAccompanied H3024
2016-03-10HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2016-02-04JointHearing scheduled for 02/10/2016 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H3024 (Replaced by) 2016-11-07 - Amendment adopted (as recommended by the House committee on Ways and Means), see H4722
H439 (Similar To) 2015-09-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3754
H581 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H911 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H2368 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2612 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback