MA H2612 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4639
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to repeal the estate tax. Revenue.
Title
To abolish the death tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4639 |
2015-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4639 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3045 (Similar To) 2016-05-23 - Accompanied H3024
H439 (Similar To) 2015-09-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3754
H581 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H911 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H2368 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H3045 (Similar To) 2016-05-23 - Accompanied H3024
H439 (Similar To) 2015-09-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3754
H581 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H911 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H2368 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2612 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2612.pdf |