CA SB1047 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 7 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 7 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 22.6 (commencing with Section 22602) to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, and to add Sections 11547.6 and 11547.7 to the Government Code, relating to artificial intelligence.
Title
Safe and Secure Innovation for Frontier Artificial Intelligence Models Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1047 Wiener et al (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1047 Wiener et al (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 2). |
2024-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 4091.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3969.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3721.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3447.) (April 2). |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and G.O. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22602 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 11547.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 11547.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |