CA AB3162 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - In committee: Referred to suspense file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - In committee: Referred to suspense file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 15007.5 to the Fish and Game Code, relating to fish and wildlife.
Title
Octopus: aquaculture: sale: prohibition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - AB 3162 Bennett Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - AB 3162 Bennett Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2024-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-04-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 10.) |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 17). |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 15007.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |