WI AB149 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Referred to committee on Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber 108.04 (2) (ae); to renumber and amend 108.14 (19); to amend 108.04 (2) (bm), 108.04 (2) (g) 2., 108.04 (11) (cm), 108.14 (21) and 108.22 (8) (a); and to create 108.04 (1) (hg), 108.04 (2) (ae) 1., 108.04 (2) (hL), 108.14 (19) (b) and 108.14 (28) of the statutes; Relating to: various changes to the unemployment insurance law. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various changes to the unemployment insurance law. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-13HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2023-08-04HouseReport vetoed by the Governor on 8-4-2023
2023-08-02HousePresented to the Governor on 8-2-2023
2023-06-12HouseReport correctly enrolled on 6-12-2023
2023-06-07HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2023-06-07SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2023-06-07SenateRead a third time and concurred in, Ayes 22, Noes 11
2023-06-07SenateRules suspended to give bill its third reading
2023-06-07SenateOrdered to a third reading
2023-06-07SenateRead a second time
2023-06-05SenatePlaced on calendar 6-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2023-06-05SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2023-05-26SenateAvailable for scheduling
2023-05-26SenateReport concurrence recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges, Ayes 4, Noes 2
2023-05-24SenateExecutive action taken
2023-05-02SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges
2023-04-26SenateReceived from Assembly
2023-04-25HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2023-04-25HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 60, Noes 35
2023-04-25HouseRules suspended
2023-04-25HouseOrdered to a third reading
2023-04-25HouseRead a second time
2023-04-24HouseRepresentative Kitchens added as a coauthor
2023-04-20HousePlaced on calendar 4-25-2023 by Committee on Rules
2023-04-18HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2023-04-18HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Workforce Development and Economic Opportunities, Ayes 10, Noes 5
2023-04-18HouseExecutive action taken
2023-04-17HouseFiscal estimate received
2023-04-12HousePublic hearing held
2023-04-11HouseRepresentative Michalski added as a coauthor
2023-04-11HouseSenator Ballweg added as a cosponsor
2023-04-07HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development and Economic Opportunities
2023-04-07HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback