MA H3941 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize supplemental financing of housing first programs, state public housing renovations, and other housing programs and to make related changes in certain laws. Housing.
Title
Financing housing first programs and housing for all in Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-15 | House | House concurred |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday July 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-04 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-04 | House | No further action take on the extension to Thursday, April 18, 2024 |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday April 18, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-01-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/02/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-06-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3941 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3941.pdf |