MA S932 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2204

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide for a special commission to study the feasibility and cost of adopting the federal parole guidelines. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve providing for a special commission to study the feasibility and cost of adopting the federal parole guidelines

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-04SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2204
2015-05-20JointHearing scheduled for 05/27/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S2204 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S801 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H513 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S722 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S620 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
H3189 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H3045 (Similar To) 2016-05-23 - Accompanied H3024
S168 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback