MA S801 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2204

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the emergency administration of certain overdose prevention drugs. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the emergency administration of certain overdose prevention drugs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-04SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2204
2015-10-27JointHearing scheduled for 11/03/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S2204 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S362 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2316
H1155 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4310
S1045 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S806 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1293 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S763 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1855 (Similar To) 2016-01-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S995 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1225 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S909 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback