MA S620 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2356
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the equitable assignment of MassHealth enrollees. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to the equitable assignment of MassHealth enrollees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2356 |
2015-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S2356 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S585 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S592 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S593 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S570 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H985 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied S619
S983 (Similar To) 2016-01-28 - New draft substituted, see S2107
S491 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S997 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1980
S490 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1999 (Similar To) 2016-07-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 166 of the Acts of 2016
S585 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S592 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S593 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S570 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H985 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied S619
S983 (Similar To) 2016-01-28 - New draft substituted, see S2107
S491 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S997 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1980
S490 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1999 (Similar To) 2016-07-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 166 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S620 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S620.pdf |